Hon Abraham SHEK Lai-him, SBS, JP |
Category of interests | Date of registration | |
1. | Directorships |
5.10.2004
10.10.2005 9.3.2006 16.3.2006 10.5.2006 27.6.2006 5.7.2006 28.7.2006 8.9.2006 20.9.2006 9.1.2007 9.3.2007 16.4.2007 24.4.2007 14.6.2007 30.8.2007 18.9.2007 1.11.2007 20.11.2007 7.1.2008 28.1.2008 6.2.2008 7.5.2008 13.5.2008 |
2. | Remunerated Employment, Offices, etc. |
5.10.2004
27.11.2007 4.6.2008 |
3. | Clients | 5.10.2004
|
4. | Election donations/Financial Sponsorships |
5.10.2004
|
5. | Overseas Visits |
5.10.2004 3.10.2007 |
6. | Payments, benefits and advantages received from any Government or organization of a place outside Hong Kong or from any person who does not qualify as a "Hong Kong permanent resident" |
5.10.2004
|
7. | Land and Property |
5.10.2004
|
8. | Shareholdings |
5.10.2004
3.6.2005 10.5.2006 27.6.2006 20.11.2007 |
9. | Miscellaneous |
5.10.2004
6.12.2004 14.12.2004 3.6.2005* 5.1.2006 |