Hon Christopher CHUNG Shu-kun, BBS, MH, JP |
Category of interests | Date of registration | |
1. | Directorships |
9.10.2012*
5.2.2013* 25.9.2015* |
2. | Remunerated Employment, Offices, etc. |
9.10.2012*
5.2.2013* |
3. | Clients |
9.10.2012*
|
4. | Election donations/Financial Sponsorships |
9.10.2012*
29.1.2013* 18.6.2013* 14.7.2016* |
5. | Overseas Visits |
9.10.2012*
|
6. | Payments, benefits and advantages received from any Government or organization of a place outside Hong Kong or from any person who does not qualify as a "Hong Kong permanent resident" |
9.10.2012*
|
7. | Land and Property |
9.10.2012*
|
8. | Shareholdings |
9.10.2012*
|
9. | Miscellaneous |
9.10.2012*
23.1.2014* 1.9.2014* 22.9.2014* 20.11.2014* 9.12.2014* 10.4.2015* 25.9.2015* 9.10.2015* 13.10.2015* 16.11.2015* 15.12.2015* 11.1.2016* 16.2.2016* 10.3.2016* |