Hon Jeffrey LAM Kin-fung, GBS, JP |
Category of interests | Date of registration | |
1. | Directorships |
9.10.2012
30.10.2012 21.12.2012 28.10.2013* 12.5.2014 2.3.2015* 19.5.2015* 8.7.2016* |
2. | Remunerated Employment, Offices, etc. |
9.10.2012
19.10.2012 14.4.2014* 16.4.2015* 25.1.2016* |
3. | Clients |
9.10.2012
|
4. | Election donations/Financial Sponsorships |
9.10.2012
|
5. | Overseas Visits |
9.10.2012
|
6. | Payments, benefits and advantages received from any Government or organization of a place outside Hong Kong or from any person who does not qualify as a "Hong Kong permanent resident" |
9.10.2012
|
7. | Land and Property |
9.10.2012
|
8. | Shareholdings |
9.10.2012
30.10.2012 21.12.2012 15.12.2015 |
9. | Miscellaneous |
9.10.2012
15.10.2012 30.10.2012 31.10.2012 21.12.2012 7.1.2013 2.1.2014* 17.4.2014* 27.6.2014 9.1.2015 20.7.2015* 9.11.2015* 29.12.2015 18.1.2016 4.5.2016* 12.5.2016* 18.5.2016* 1.6.2016* |