Hon Abraham SHEK Lai-him, GBS, JP |
Category of interests | Date of registration | |
1. | Directorships |
27.9.2012
21.12.2012 6.3.2013 10.4.2013 30.12.2013 6.3.2014 13.5.2014 2.1.2015 13.4.2015 9.7.2015 17.8.2015 1.3.2016 3.5.2016 |
2. | Remunerated Employment, Offices, etc. |
27.9.2012
|
3. | Clients |
27.9.2012
|
4. | Election donations/Financial Sponsorships |
27.9.2012
|
5. | Overseas Visits |
27.9.2012
25.7.2013 |
6. | Payments, benefits and advantages received from any Government or organization of a place outside Hong Kong or from any person who does not qualify as a "Hong Kong permanent resident" |
27.9.2012
|
7. | Land and Property |
27.9.2012
|
8. | Shareholdings |
27.9.2012
20.4.2015 12.11.2015 |
9. | Miscellaneous |
27.9.2012
11.4.2014 19.3.2015 1.4.2015 20.4.2015 21.4.2015 7.5.2015 12.11.2015 |