Hon WONG Yuk-man |
Category of interests | Date of registration | |
1. | Directorships |
10.10.2012*
|
2. | Remunerated Employment, Offices, etc. |
10.10.2012*
15.5.2014* 20.5.2014* 30.7.2014* |
3. | Clients |
10.10.2012*
|
4. | Election donations/Financial Sponsorships |
10.10.2012*
7.12.2012* 2.9.2013* 4.9.2013* 10.9.2013* 17.3.2014* 15.5.2014* 30.7.2014* 2.9.2014* 30.10.2014* 2.1.2015* 14.4.2015* 25.6.2015* 22.10.2015* 18.11.2015* 29.1.2016* 27.6.2016* 14.7.2016* |
5. | Overseas Visits |
10.10.2012*
18.6.2014* 3.12.2014* |
6. | Payments, benefits and advantages received from any Government or organization of a place outside Hong Kong or from any person who does not qualify as a "Hong Kong permanent resident" |
10.10.2012*
|
7. | Land and Property |
10.10.2012*
|
8. | Shareholdings |
10.10.2012*
2.10.2013* 2.9.2014* |
9. | Miscellaneous |
10.10.2012*
15.11.2012* 4.1.2013* 21.1.2013* 1.3.2013* 19.3.2013* 19.4.2013* 29.5.2013* 17.6.2013* 18.7.2013* 2.9.2013* 25.9.2015* 13.11.2015* 18.11.2015* 29.1.2016* |